|
10/05/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 496, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 2923.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 19. Page 3260.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2017
|
July 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2017
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1386.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Published May 26 at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1177.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
April 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 443.) (March 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2017
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
March 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Set for hearing March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2017
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|