|
07/21/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 100, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
07/21/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2017
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 14. Page 2471.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 802.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 751.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2017
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
March 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|