Assembly | 06/21/2017 | June 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2017 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2017 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1074.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Set for hearing May 15. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Set for hearing May 8. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 827.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Set for hearing April 25. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |