|
09/14/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 403, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5420.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6301.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4115.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2018
|
Set for hearing January 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 4020.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/21/2017
|
Set for hearing January 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
April 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|