Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Senate | 01/09/2018 | January 9 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 4006.) | ||
Senate | 12/21/2017 | Set for hearing January 9. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | April 4 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 598.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Set for hearing April 4. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2017 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 01/06/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 5. | ||
Senate | 01/05/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |