|
09/26/2018
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2018
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6150.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4112.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4056.) (January 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2018
|
Set for hearing January 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2018
|
January 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2018
|
Set for hearing January 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4020.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2018
|
Set for hearing January 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|