Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2017 | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Set for hearing May 22. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | May 15 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Set for hearing May 15. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Set for hearing May 8. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 785.) (April 19). | ||
Senate | 04/17/2017 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (March 28). | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Set for hearing April 19 in EQ. pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Set for hearing March 28. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |