Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Senate | 01/09/2018 | January 9 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 4006.) | ||
Senate | 12/21/2017 | Set for hearing January 9. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | April 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Set for hearing April 4. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S., N.R. & W., and APPR. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |