Senate | 01/30/2018 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 12. Noes 18. Page 4126.) | ||
Senate | 01/22/2018 | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4070.) | ||
Senate | 01/22/2018 | Motion to reconsider made by Senator Anderson. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2018 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 16. Noes 16. Page 4070.) | ||
Senate | 01/10/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/09/2018 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 4007.) (January 9). | ||
Senate | 01/04/2018 | Set for hearing January 9. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2017 | June 6 hearing: Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2017 | Set for hearing June 6. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | May 9 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 6. Page 1021.) | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Set for hearing May 9. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |