Assembly
|
08/30/2017
|
August 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2017
|
July 19 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1069.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 825.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
April 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|