Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2017 | April 26 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Set for hearing April 26. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | April 5 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |