|
10/10/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 652, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/18/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3203.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2017
|
August 30 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
August 23 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2017
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1334.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Published May 26 at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1189.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 829.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|