|
09/29/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 930, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 6136.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 6069.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6028.) Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 11. Page 6765.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2018
|
June 12 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4067.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4020.) (January 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2018
|
Set for hearing January 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
April 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2017
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|