Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | May 9 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | (Corrected May 4). | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2017 | Set for hearing May 9. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | April 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Set for hearing April 25. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2017 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |