Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | April 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Re-referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |