Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2017 | June 13 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/07/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Set for hearing June 13. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and AGRI. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |