07/17/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 77, Statutes of 2017. | |||
07/17/2017 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 07/07/2017 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2017 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 1839.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2017 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 06/29/2017 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2405.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/19/2017 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 06/15/2017 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 14). | ||
Senate | 05/26/2017 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |