|
10/07/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 572, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2893.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 3253.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2017
|
July 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 1261.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Set for hearing May 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
May 15 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 808.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2017
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|