Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | April 18 set for final hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 747.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2017 | Set for hearing April 18. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | April 25 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Set for hearing April 25. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | April 4 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Set for hearing April 4. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | March 28 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Set for hearing March 28. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2017 | March 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Set for hearing March 21. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2017 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |