|
07/24/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 133, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
07/24/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3900.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2471.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1138.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Published May 16 at 12:11 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Published May 9 at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 946.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|