|
07/21/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 101, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
07/21/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2017
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2475.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 955.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 913.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2017
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 749.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|