Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
August 23 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 6480.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2018
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2017
|
July 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E., R., & S.S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1263.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1177.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2017
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 745.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2017
|
Set for hearing March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|