Assembly
|
06/25/2018
|
June 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2018
|
June 11 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 4105.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4056.) (January 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2018
|
Set for hearing January 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2018
|
January 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2018
|
Set for hearing January 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 4007.) (January 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/21/2017
|
Set for hearing January 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|