|
09/29/2018
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2018
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 6177.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 6197.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6145.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2018
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2018
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 46. Noes 27. Page 3071.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2017
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 1383.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1190.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2017
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 785.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
April 5 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|