Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2018
|
June 6 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4069.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2018
|
Set for hearing January 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4005.) (January 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2018
|
Set for hearing January 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|