California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB785 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2018

Chaptered

Bill May 17, 2018

Amended

Bill April 23, 2018
Bill March 12, 2018
Bill August 22, 2017
Bill July 10, 2017
Bill May 23, 2017
Bill May 4, 2017