Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
September 8 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 5.) Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 2999.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Re-referred to Coms. on NAT. RES., L. GOV., and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2017
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2017
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bonta.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bonta.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 799.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2017
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 626.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|