California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB799 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 5, 2017

Amended

Bill August 24, 2017
Bill July 3, 2017
Bill May 26, 2017
Bill May 1, 2017
Bill April 20, 2017
Bill April 17, 2017