Assembly | 09/01/2017 | September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Assembly | 08/23/2017 | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 08/21/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2017 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2017 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2017 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 1279.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1175.) (May 25). | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | April 3 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2017 | Set for hearing April 3. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 429.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Set for hearing March 21. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 12/06/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. | ||
Senate | 12/05/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |