California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB801 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 14, 2017

Amended

Bill September 8, 2017
Bill September 5, 2017
Bill August 28, 2017
Bill July 19, 2017
Bill July 5, 2017
Bill May 2, 2017
Bill April 17, 2017
Bill April 6, 2017
Bill March 29, 2017