Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2017
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2017
|
June 26 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and C. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 1212.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Set for hearing May 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
May 15 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 751.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Set for hearing April 19 in EQ. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Re-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|