Assembly | 07/12/2017 | July 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/15/2017 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2017 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2017 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 7. Page 1344.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2017 | Published May 26 at 10 a.m. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2017 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2017 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1191.) (May 25). | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Set for hearing May 15. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Set for hearing May 8. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 849.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2017 | Set for hearing April 26. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |