Senate | 04/19/2018 | Set for hearing April 25 in GOV. & F. pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2018 | April 17 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 6. Page 4723.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2018 | Set for hearing April 17. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2018 | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 01/04/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3. | ||
Senate | 01/03/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |