|
09/30/2018
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2018
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 6130.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Urgency clause adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 6069.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6028.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 3. Page 6769.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2018
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on B. & P. and REV. & TAX. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5089.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4994.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2018
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
April 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 4723.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2018
|
Re-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|