Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2018
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 5802.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4920.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4865.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2018
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|