|
09/17/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 449, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6046.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 6040.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 18. Page 6780.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 6705.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 23. Page 6286.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4926.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4865.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2018
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|