California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB872 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2018

Enrolled

Bill July 2, 2018

Chaptered

Bill July 9, 2018

Amended

Bill June 27, 2018
Bill June 25, 2018