California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB880 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 21, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2018

Amended

Bill August 6, 2018
Bill June 20, 2018
Bill April 9, 2018