LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2017-2018 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB893
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB893
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2017-2018 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB893
Action History
Senate
04/18/2018
April 17 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 7. Page 4724.)
Senate
04/09/2018
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
Senate
04/05/2018
Set for hearing April 17.
Senate
01/24/2018
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
Senate
01/12/2018
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
Senate
01/11/2018
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.