Senate | 05/31/2018 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator McGuire. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2018 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2018 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 4884.) (April 25). | ||
Senate | 03/23/2018 | Set for hearing April 25. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2018 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on I., B. & F.I. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2018 | Referred to Com. on I., B. & F.I. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 15. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |