Assembly | 06/27/2018 | June 27 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2018 | June 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2018 | Referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2018 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2018 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 4344.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2018 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4298.) (May 25). | ||
Senate | 05/23/2018 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2018 | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2018 | Set for hearing May 22. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2018 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2018 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 4884.) (April 25). | ||
Senate | 04/06/2018 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 15. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |