Senate | 02/01/2018 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | March 28 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Set for hearing March 28. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2017 | March 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Set for hearing March 14. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2017 | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 12/06/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. | ||
Senate | 12/05/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |