Senate | 04/25/2018 | April 24 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 4817.) | ||
Senate | 04/16/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2018 | For vote only. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2018 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2018 | April 3 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 4515.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2018 | Set for hearing April 3. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2018 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |