Senate | 05/25/2018 | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2018 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2018 | April 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2018 | Set for hearing April 16. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2018 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2018 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4417.) (March 20). | ||
Senate | 03/14/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2018 | Set for hearing March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2018 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 22. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |