|
09/27/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 841, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6114.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6981.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4399.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4299.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
May 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2018
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 4821.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4624.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2018
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|