Senate | 05/25/2018 | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2018 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2018 | April 30 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2018 | Set for hearing April 30. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2018 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2018 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4697.) (April 17). | ||
Senate | 04/06/2018 | Set for hearing April 17. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 25. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |