Assembly | 06/26/2018 | June 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2018 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2018 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2018 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4345.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2018 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4299.) (May 25). | ||
Senate | 05/18/2018 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2018 | April 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2018 | Set for hearing April 16. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2018 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2018 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4375.) (March 14). | ||
Senate | 03/05/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2018 | Set for hearing March 14. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2018 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |