|
09/18/2018
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2018
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 5546.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 20. Page 6399.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 4401.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4300.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2018
|
April 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 4375.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2018
|
Set for hearing March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|