Senate | 05/08/2018 | May 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2018 | Set for hearing May 8. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2018 | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 3. Page 4719.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2018 | Set for hearing April 18. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2018 | Re-referred to Coms. on EQ. and APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |