California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB955 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 18, 2018

Amended

Bill August 20, 2018
Bill April 18, 2018
Bill March 14, 2018